EP1109706 - WIPER BLADE FOR WINDSHIELDS, ESPECIALLY AUTOMOBILE WINDSHIELDS, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BLOCK, Peter Pandputweg 5 B-3545 Halen / BE | [2001/26] | Application number, filing date | 00952897.7 | 06.07.2000 | [2001/26] | WO2000DE02168 | Priority number, date | DE1999131858 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931858 | DE1999131856 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931856 | DE1999131857 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19931857 | DE2000132048 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10032048 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0103982 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109706 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109706 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B60S1/3874 (EP,US);
B60S1/38 (EP,US);
B60S1/3875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WISCHBLATT FÜR SCHEIBEN, INSBESONDERE VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SOLCHEN | [2001/26] | English: | WIPER BLADE FOR WINDSHIELDS, ESPECIALLY AUTOMOBILE WINDSHIELDS, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2001/26] | French: | RACLETTE D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR VITRE, NOTAMMENT POUR PARE-BRISE DE VEHICULE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 26.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE1247161 (WALTER D APPEL) [DA] 1,7,8,10,12,15-17* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0528643 (ANGLO AMERICAN IND CORP LTD [ZA]) [DA] 1,7,8,10,12,15-17 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0594451 (ANGLO AMERICAN IND CORP LTD [ZA]) [DA] 1,7,8,10,12,15-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 50 *; | [PA]DE19814610 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1,7,8,10,12,15-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 20 * |