EP1203414 - OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTHAUS, Hans-Ludwig Georgstr. 12 D-93138 Lappersdorf / DE | 02 /
GRAMANN, Wolfgang Josef-Bayer-Weg 1 D-93053 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
KUHN, Gerhard Am Bahnhof 11A D-93096 Köfering / DE | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00952935.5 | 13.07.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000DE02295 | Priority number, date | DE1999135496 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19935496 | [2002/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0109962 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203414 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203414 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L31/0203, H01L31/0232, H01S5/022 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G02B6/4204 (EP,US);
H01L31/0203 (EP,US);
H01L31/02325 (EP,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
H01S5/02253 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48463 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49107 (EP,US);
H01L25/167 (EP,US);
H01L33/642 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2002/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2002/19] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2002/19] | French: | COMPOSANT OPTOELECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0413489 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10,18,21,24,25 * column 5, line 36 - column 10, line 3; figures 1-9 *; | [DA]DE19527026 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-3,6-10,18-21,24,26 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPS63244781 ; | [A]JPS5897884 ; | [DA]US4967241 (KINOSHITA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,4,5,15-17,19,21,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5481386 (SHIMANO TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5907151 (GRAMANN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890206), vol. 013, no. 051, Database accession no. (E - 712), & JP63244781 A 19881012 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [DA] 1,3,7-10,12-14,19-21,24-26 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830903), vol. 007, no. 200, Database accession no. (E - 196), & JP58097884 A 19830610 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) [A] 1-3,6-10,13,21,24 * abstract * |