Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
15.04.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
28.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
30.10.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
18.10.2002 | First examination report | |
11.10.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
14.08.2002 | Renewal fee | |
05.04.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
05.04.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
26.03.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2002 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.01.2002 | Change - extension states | |
05.04.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2001 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication |