Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1206685 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2003 | B1 | EP1206685 | 22.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19937023 | 05.08.1999 | EP0006772 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50002382D1 | 03.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19937023 | 05.08.1999 | EP0006772 | 15.07.2000 | DE50002382 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6961174 | 01.11.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19937023 | 05.08.1999 | EP0006772 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0111320 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19937023 | 05.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19937023 | 08.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19937023 | 05.08.1999 |