EP1199957 - BRUSH, ESPECIALLY TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORONET-WERKE GmbH Neustadt 2 69483 Wald-Michelbach / DE | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIHRAUCH, Georg Am Rossert 1 D-69483 Wald-Michelbach / DE | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Lichti, Heiner Lichti - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 00953092.4 | 26.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000EP07159 | Priority number, date | DE1999137481 | 07.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937481 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110267 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199957 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199957 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/06 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
A46B3/04 (EP,US);
A46B9/06 (KR);
A46B3/20 (EP,US);
A46B5/0029 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
B29L2031/425 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Title | German: | BÜRSTE, INSBESONDERE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [2002/18] | English: | BRUSH, ESPECIALLY TOOTHBRUSH | [2002/18] | French: | BROSSE, EN PARTICULIER BROSSE A DENTS | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US1770195 (BURLEW GILDEROY O) [AD] 1* page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 4; figure - *; | [AD]DE3628722 (SCHLERF CORONET WERKE [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 3; figure - *; | [AD]EP0310482 (POITEVIN PHILIPPE) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 1; figure - *; | [A]US5325560 (PAVONE BERNADINO J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 46; figure - *; | [AD]US5373602 (BANG KOOK B [US]) [AD] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 24; figure - *; | [AD]WO9720484 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1 * page 7, line 21 - page 27, line 8; figure - *; | [A]WO9827846 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 22; figure - * | by applicant | US1770195 | EP0310482 | US5373602 | WO9720484 |