EP1121206 - CLEANING DEVICE FOR ROTATIONALLY SYMMETRICAL BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wohlgemuth GmbH Kurfürstenstrasse 47a 12249 Berlin / DE | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Wohlgemuth, Oliver Kurfürstenstrasse 47a 12249 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Beissbarth GmbH Hanauer Str. 101 80993 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wohlgemuth, Oliver Kurfürstenstrasse 47a 12249 Berlin / DE | [2005/12] |
Former [2005/04] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [2001/32] | 01 /
WOHLGEMUTH, Oliver Kurfürstenstr. 47a 12249 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/40] |
Former [2004/42] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Böck, Tappe, Kirschner Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/32] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00953188.0 | 21.08.2000 | [2001/32] | WO2000EP08138 | Priority number, date | DE1999139899 | 22.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19939899 | [2001/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0114072 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121206 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121206 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/12, B60S3/04 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
B08B3/12 (EP,US);
B60S3/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR ROTATIONSSYMMETRISCHE KÖRPER | [2001/32] | English: | CLEANING DEVICE FOR ROTATIONALLY SYMMETRICAL BODIES | [2001/32] | French: | UNITE DE NETTOYAGE POUR CORPS A SYMETRIE DE REVOLUTION | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2001 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.08.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   30.08.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.12.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | IE | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | AT | 21.08.2005 | CY | 21.08.2005 | LU | 21.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | ES | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
AT | 21.08.2005 | ||
CY | 21.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | ES | 11.05.2005 | |
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
AT | 21.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
AT | 21.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2148862 (LEA JOANNE MARY) [X] 1,5-7* page 1, line 127 - page 2, line 90; figures 3,4 *; | [YA]WO9011210 (HAKALA EINO [FI]) [Y] 1-3,10,12,14-17 * page 1, lines 10-27; figure - * * page 2, line 25 - page 5, line 34 * [A] 9; | [XA]DD286524 (ILMENAU TECH HOCHSCHULE [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,10,11,14,15,17 * the whole document * [A] 8; | [Y]DE4038662 (ALLGUTH MINERALOEL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,10,12,14-17 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 54; figure - * |