EP1214076 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION OF ETHINYLESTRADIOL AND DROSPIRENONE FOR USE AS A CONTRACEPTIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2011/34] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIL, Wolfgang Münchener Strasse 26/27 D-10825 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HILMAN, Jürgen Ugandastrasse 9 D-13351 Berlin / DE | 03 /
LIPP, Ralph Holzungsweg 63 D-14169 Berlin / DE | 04 /
HEITHECKER, Renate Wolzogenstrasse 15 D-14163 Berlin / DE | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2002/25] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11 P.O.Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 00953387.8 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000IB01213 | Priority number, date | EP19990202826 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: EP 99202826 | US19990386274 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 386274 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115701 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214076 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214076 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/565, A61K31/585, A61P15/00 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP);
A61K31/585 (EP,KR);
A61K31/57 (EP);
A61K31/58 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61P5/28 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/585, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/47] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 02.04.2002 | LV | 02.04.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 02.04.2002 | SI | 02.04.2002 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATION VON ETHINYLESTRADIOL UND DROSPIRENONE ALS EMPFÄNGNISVERHÜTENDES MITTEL | [2002/25] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION OF ETHINYLESTRADIOL AND DROSPIRENONE FOR USE AS A CONTRACEPTIVE | [2002/25] | French: | MELANGE PHARMACEUTIQUE D'ETHINYLESTRADIOL ET DE DROSPIRENONE UTILISE EN TANT QUE CONTRACEPTIF | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03017743.0 / EP1380301 | EP05076943.9 / EP1598069 | EP08015966.8 / EP2044941 | EP10185672.2 / EP2305267 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Hexal Pharmaforschung GmbH Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Hamm, Volker Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Hexal Pharmaforschung GmbH Industriestrasse 25 83607 Holzkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Hamm, Volker, Dr. Maiwald Patentanwalts-GmbH Ballindamm 37 20095 Hamburg / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 23.09.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 22.12.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/17] | 22.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 19.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T0007/07 | 16.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.07.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Petition(s) for review: | 25.11.2011 | Petition for review received | Number: R0018/11 | for appeal No. T0007/07-3302 | Petitioner: APPR | 22.11.2012 | Decision: Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only. | 22.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 19.11.2003 | LI | 19.11.2003 | [2013/20] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9517194 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract *; | [X]WO9526730 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract *; | [X]WO9701342 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract *; | [X]WO9804267 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract *; | [X]WO9804269 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract * * page 9, lines 20-25; claims 3,5,18-21,23,29 *; | [X] - OELKERS W K H, "Effects of estrogens and progestogens on the renin-aldosterone system and blood pressure", STEROIDS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND REGULATION,US,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, (19960401), vol. 61, no. 4, ISSN 0039-128X, pages 166 - 171, XP004026568 [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-128X(96)00007-4 | [X] - OELKERS W ET AL, "EFFECTS OF A NEW ORAL CONTRACEPTIVE CONTAINING AN ANTIMINERALOCORTICOID PROGESTOGEN, DROSPIRENONE, ON THE RENIN-ALDOSTERONE SYSTEM, BODY WEIGHT, BLOOD PRESSURE, GLUCOSE TOLERANCE, AND LIPID METABOLISM", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM,US,NEW YORK, NY, (19950601), vol. 80, no. 6, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 1816 - 1821, XP002046619 [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.80.6.1816 | [XY] - MUHN P ET AL, "Drospirenone: a novel progestogen with antimineralocorticoid and antiandrogenic activity. Pharmacological characterization in animal models.", CONTRACEPTION, (1995 FEB) 51 (2) 99-110., XP000908817 [X] 1,3,5,6,10-14,16-19,21-26,28-34,36,38,41,43-45 * abstract * * page 106 * [Y] 2,4,15,20,35,37,40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-7824(94)00015-O | [Y] - NUERNBERG E., "[Manufacturing and properties of spray dried products]. HERSTELLUNG UND EIGENSCHAFTEN PHARMAZEUTISCHER SPRUHTROCKNUNGSPRODUKTE.", ACTA PHARMACEUTICA HUNGARICA, (1978) 48/1 (19-35). CODEN: APHGAO, XP000908820 [Y] 2,4,15,20,35,37,40 * abstract * * page 33 * |