EP1261658 - CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLY(TRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTHALATE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIARDINO, Carl, J. 1800 Connies Lane Hixson, TN 37343 / US | 02 /
GRIFFITH, David, B. 18014 Spellbrook Drive Houston, TX 77084 / US | 03 /
HO, Chungfah, Howard 3203 Hodges Road Kinston, NC 28504 / US | 04 /
HOWELL, James, M. 108 South Baywood Lane Greenville, NC 27834 / US | 05 /
WATKINS, Michelle, Hoyt 611 Ashby Drive Waynesboro, VA 22980 / US | 06 /
DUFFY, Joseph, James 16 Bristol Lane Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/49] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00953908.1 | 10.08.2000 | [2002/49] | WO2000US21778 | Priority number, date | US20000501700 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: US 501700 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0158980 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261658 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261658 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1261658 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/183, C08G63/78 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C08G63/183 (EP,US);
C08G63/78 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/49] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLY(TRIMETHYLENTEREPHTHALAT) | [2002/49] | English: | CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLY(TRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTHALATE) | [2002/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION EN CONTINU DE POLY(TRIMETHYLENE TEREPHTALATE) | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 03.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
27.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Solotex Corporation Shin-Daibiru Bldg., 2-6 Dojimahama, 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530-8205 / JP Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | 02
15.07.2004
26.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
27.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Solotex Corporation Shin-Daibiru Bldg., 2-6 Dojimahama, 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530-8205 / JP Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
02
15.07.2004
26.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partner Patentanwaltskanzlei Barckhausstrasse 12-16 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [2009/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
27.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Solotex Corporation Shin-Daibiru Bldg., 2-6 Dojimahama, 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530-8205 / JP Opponent's representative Weber, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
02
15.07.2004
26.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partner Patentanwaltskanzlei Barckhausstrasse 12-16 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [2004/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
Solotex Corporation Shin-Daibiru Bldg., 2-6 Dojimahama, 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530-8205 / JP Opponent's representative Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
02
15.07.2004
Zimmer Aktiengesellschaft Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Erbe, Claudia, et al, et al Dr. Meyer-Dulheuer Patentanwaltkanzlei Metzlerstrasse 27 60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [2004/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2004
Solotex Corporation Shin-Daibiru Bldg., 2-6 Dojimahama, 1-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530-8205 / JP Opponent's representative Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | 19.08.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.05.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.01.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 13.02.2007 | Appeal received No. T0095/07 | 21.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.05.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 31.01.2007 | Appeal received No. T0095/07 | 17.01.2007 | Appeal received No. T0095/07 | 29.05.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.06.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2003 | CH | 15.10.2003 | CY | 15.10.2003 | FI | 15.10.2003 | LI | 15.10.2003 | DK | 15.01.2004 | GR | 15.01.2004 | SE | 15.01.2004 | PT | 15.03.2004 | IE | 10.08.2004 | LU | 10.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | NL | 01.03.2006 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
IE | 10.08.2004 | ||
LU | 10.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
IE | 10.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
IE | 10.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 15.10.2003 | |
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 15.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0547553 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * examples 1-5 *; | [D]US5340909 (DOERR MARVIN L [US], et al); | [A]US5459229 (KELSEY DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [X]US5599900 (BHATIA KAMLESH K [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * the whole document * | Opposition | US4110316 | US5798433 | EP1046662 |