EP1307111 - PRODUCTS COMPRISING CORN OIL AND CORN MEAL OBTAINED FROM HIGH OIL CORN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renessen LLC 3000 Lake Side Drive, 300 S Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULRICH, James, Francis 221 Burchell Avenue Highwood, Illinois 60040 / US | 02 /
JAKEL, Neal, Torrey 530 E. Burr Oak Dr. Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | 03 /
DYER, Daniel, Jeffrey 22874 Ridgewood Lane Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | 04 /
LOHRMANN, Troy, Thomas 828 Longwood Dr. Lake Villa, IL 60036 / US | [2003/21] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
ULRICH, James, Francis 221 Burchell Avenue Highwood, Illinois 60040 / US | ||
02 /
JAKEL, Neal, Torrey 530 E. Burr Oak Dr. Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | |||
03 /
DYER, Daniel, Jeffrey 22874 Ridgewood Lane Kildeer, IL 60047 / US | |||
04 /
LOHRMANN, Troy, Thomas 828 Longwood Dr. Lake Villa, IL 60036 / US | |||
05 /
MATOS, Rick Innovar, L.L.C. Box 250647 Plano, TX 75025-0647 / US | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2003/19] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Bissel Salleck + Partner, Nürnberger Strasse 69/71 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00954043.6 | 11.08.2000 | [2003/19] | WO2000US22207 | Priority number, date | US20000637843 | 10.08.2000 Original published format: US 637843 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0213624 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307111 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/14, C11B1/10, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A23D9/00, A23L1/30 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A23K10/30 (EP);
A23K40/25 (US);
A23D9/00 (EP);
A23K20/147 (EP);
A23K20/158 (EP);
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K40/30 (EP);
A23K50/00 (EP);
A23K50/75 (EP);
A23K50/80 (EP);
C11B1/10 (EP);
Y02A40/818 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | A23K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAISOEL ENTHALTENDE PRODUKTE UND MAISMEHL, GEWONNEN AUS OELREICHEM MAIS | [2003/19] | English: | PRODUCTS COMPRISING CORN OIL AND CORN MEAL OBTAINED FROM HIGH OIL CORN | [2003/19] | French: | PRODUITS CONTENANT DE L'HUILE ET DE LA SEMOULE DE MAIS OBTENUS A PARTIR DE MAIS A FORTE TENEUR EN HUILE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2010 | 31.08.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5706603 (BERGQUIST RICHARD ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 26,32,33 * column 15, line 61 - line 64 * * column 18, line 7 - line 10 * [Y] 1,74; | [E]WO0047702 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [E] 26,32,33 * the whole document *; | [Y] - S.H. KAPLAN, "Modified dry milling of corn grain", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., GBKENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE., (19960410), vol. 384, no. 035, pages 1 - 5, XP002325907 [Y] 1,74 * the whole document * | [X] - J.M. AGUILERA ET AL., "Laboratory and pilot solvent extraction of extruded high-oil corn", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY., AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY. CHAMPAIGN., US, (1986), vol. 63, no. 2, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 239 - 243, XP002199800 [X] 26,32,33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02546146 | International search | [X]WO9522598 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [X]US5675065 (BERGQUIST RICHARD R [US]); | [X]US5750851 (GEADELMANN JON L [US], et al); | [Y]US5851572 (COOK MARK E [US], et al) |