EP1121220 - WELDING OF LAMP LEADS TO STRANDED WIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kellner, Robert, Joseph 25 Fairway Lane Mattoon, IL 61938 / US | 02 /
Greenwood, Randal 785 Walk Avenue, P.O. Box 134 Neoga, IL 62447 / US | 03 /
Lagermasini, Joseph, Paul, III 703 22nd Street Charleston, IL 61920 / US | 04 /
Rachel, Bernard, White 668 Davidson Drive Highland Heights, OH 44143 / US | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00954087.3 | 14.08.2000 | [2001/32] | WO2000US22387 | Priority number, date | US19990148634P | 12.08.1999 Original published format: US 148634 P | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112377 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121220 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121220 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23K10/02, H01K1/42, H01J5/62 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
H01J61/36 (EP);
B23K10/02 (EP);
H01J5/62 (EP);
H01R4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/46] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHWEISSEN VON LAMPENLEITERN MIT LITZENDRÄHTEN | [2001/32] | English: | WELDING OF LAMP LEADS TO STRANDED WIRES | [2001/32] | French: | SOUDAGE DES FILS D'UNE LAMPE A DES FILS TORONNES | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 22.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5463270 (WAKIMIZU YUKIO ET AL) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 10 - line 30; figure 7 *; | [A]US3771018 (MEDENDORP N ET AL) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 15 - line 18; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4638150 (WHITNEY WELLS) [A] 1,7 * example 1 * |