Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6676100 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0000950 | 17.08.2000 | US14924999 | 17.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1257273 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA0000950 | 17.08.2000 | US14924999 | 17.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2419845 | 22.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0000950 | 17.08.2000 | US14924999 | 17.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6413999 | 02.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US14924999 | 17.08.1999 | US64002000 | 17.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0112166 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2001 | A3 | WO0112166 | 22.02.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14924999 | 17.08.1999 |