EP1257273 - IMPROVED TREATMENT FOR ACUTE PHYSICAL INSULT TO THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM BY NEUROTRAUMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/47] | IMPROVED TREATMENT FOR ACUTE PHYSICAL INSULT TO THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | ||
[2005/31] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Saskatchewan Technologies Inc. 107 Wiggins Road, University of Saskatchewan Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7N 5E5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states University of Saskatchewan Technologies Inc. 107 Wiggins Road, University of Saskatchewan Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 5E5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUURLINK, Bernhard, H., J. 251 Whiteswan Drive Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7K 4M6 / CA | 02 /
PATERSON, Phyllis, G. 307 Arthur Avenue Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 1J4 / CA | 03 /
KAMENCIC, Huse 112-111 Wedge Road Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7L 6S8 / CA | 04 /
GRIEBEL, Robert, W. 1288 Elliott Street Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 0V6 / CA | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00954209.3 | 17.08.2000 | [2002/47] | WO2000CA00950 | Priority number, date | US19990149249P | 17.08.1999 Original published format: US 149249 P | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0112166 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1257273 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/426, A61K31/57, A61P9/10, A61P25/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/426, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K31/425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE BEHANDLUNG FÜR DIE AKUTE PHYSISCHE VERLETZUNG DES ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEMS DURCH NEUROTRAUMA | [2005/31] | English: | IMPROVED TREATMENT FOR ACUTE PHYSICAL INSULT TO THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM BY NEUROTRAUMA | [2005/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT AMELIORE DE TROUBLES PHYSIQUES AIGUS DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL PAR TRAUMATISME NEUROLOGIQUE | [2005/31] |
Former [2002/47] | VERBESSERTE BEHANDLUNG FÜR DIE AKUTE PHYSISCHE VERLETZUNG DES ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2002/47] | IMPROVED TREATMENT FOR ACUTE PHYSICAL INSULT TO THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | ||
Former [2002/47] | TRAITEMENT AMELIORE DE TROUBLES PHYSIQUES AIGUS DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 10.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.08.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | 01.08.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.08.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   29.08.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4426378 (HOLADAY JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-19,22 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 23 * * column 3, line 31 - line 56 * * column 4, line 1 - line 53 * * column 5, line 7 - line 26 * * claims 3,7 *; | [XY]EP0501637 (CLINTEC NUTRITION CO [US]) [X] 1-19,22 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 28 * * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 16 * * page 3, line 52 - line 55 * * claims 4,6-10,14,15 * [Y] 1,2,13,15; | [Y]EP0583863 (CLINTEC NUTRITION CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,13,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 25 * * column 2, line 41 - line 51 * * column 3, line 4 - line 35 * * column 4, line 3 - line 15 * * column 5, line 7 - line 14 * * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]US5750507 (OZAWA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-19,22,23,26 * column 1, line 50 - line 55 * * column 2, line 24 - line 40 *; | [Y]WO9829101 (ANTIOXIDANT PHARMACEUTICALS CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-19,22,23,26 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - line 19 * * page 14, line 20 * * page 21, line 19 - line 37 * * page 23, line 7 - line 12 * * page 24, line 30 - line 33 * * page 29, line 24 - line 31 * * page 31, line 7 - line 20 * * example 2 * * claims 1,50,51,55 *; | [A]US5863906 (ARNAL MAURICE [FR], et al) [A] 20,21,24 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - line 23 * * column 2, line 10 - line 26 * * column 3, line 10 - line 14 * * column 4, line 17 - line 36 * * column 7, line 13 - line 25 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 7 * * examples 7,8,10 ** claims 12,13 *; | [X] - PATERSON, PHYLLIS G. ET AL, "Nutritional regulation of glutathione in stroke", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 133:42645, URL: STN, XP002158584 [X] 1-19,22 * abstract * | [ ] - NEUROTOXIC. RES. (1999), 1(2), 99-112 | [A] - LUCAS JEN HILL ET AL, "The endogenous antioxidant glutathione as a factor in the survival of physically injured mammalian spinal cord neurons.", JOURNAL OF NEUROPATHOLOGY & EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, (199810), vol. 57, no. 10, ISSN 0022-3069, pages 937 - 954, XP000979655 [A] 1-16,18,19,22 * abstract * * page 937, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 939, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 946, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 947, paragraph 1 * * page 947, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 949, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 950, column 2, paragraph 1 * * figures 9,10 * * page 952, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 953, column 1, paragraph 2 * | Examination | US4554271 |