EP1315936 - GRATE BAR WITH LIQUID COOLING FOR INCINERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked by proprietor Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2018 | New entry: Proprietor files request for revocation | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seko-Patent GmbH Butzenstrasse 20 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2005/35] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states KOCH, Theodor Butzenstr. 20 CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Theodor Butzenstrasse 20 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2005/35] |
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 00954246.5 | 04.09.2000 | [2003/23] | WO2000CH00467 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0221049 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315936 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315936 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23H3/02, F23H17/12 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
F23H17/12 (EP);
F23H3/02 (EP);
F23H2900/03021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROSTSTAB MIT FLÜSSIGKÜHLUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSANLAGEN | [2003/23] | English: | GRATE BAR WITH LIQUID COOLING FOR INCINERATORS | [2003/23] | French: | BARREAU DE GRILLE A REFROIDISSEMENT PAR DU LIQUIDE POUR DES INCINERATEURS | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Revocation procedure | 26.07.2017 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | ADMISSIBLE | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that patent will be revoked | 12.12.2018 | Date of legal effect of revocation of patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for revocation paid |
Former [2018/50] | 26.07.2017 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | |
ADMISSIBLE | |||
12.12.2018 | Date of legal effect of revocation of patent | ||
26.07.2017 | Fee for revocation paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 10.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]DE19650742 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 35 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 5 [Y] 4; | [XA]US5724898 (VON BOECKH PETER [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 1 - line 31 * * column 4, line 54 - line 58 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 13 * * figures 10,17,19 * [A] 6; | [X]US5636581 (KLEEN HOLGER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 47 - line 64 * * figures 1-23 *; | [Y]EP0989363 (VON ROLL UMWELTTECHNIK AG [CH]) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 22 * * column 5, line 34 - line 45 * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO9629544 | EP0811803 |