EP1214219 - Steering wheel with MULTIFUNCTION OPERATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/25] | MULTIFUNCTION OPERATING ELEMENT | ||
[2004/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIMERMANN, Matthias Campestrasse 3A 38302 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 02 /
DIRKSEN, Susanne Dunantplatz 7 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
LILIENTHAL, Jörg Zimmerer Strasse 6 38518 Gifhorn / DE | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Zucker, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Zucker, Volker, Dipl.-Ing., et al Effert, Bressel und Kollegen Patentanwälte Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00954627.6 | 14.08.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000EP07912 | Priority number, date | DE1999141960 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19941960 | [2002/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117814 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214219 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214219 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60K37/06, G06K11/18 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
G05G1/10 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
G06F3/0362 (EP);
H01H2019/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/45] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lenkrad mit MULTIFUNKTIONS-BEDIENELEMENT | [2004/05] | English: | Steering wheel with MULTIFUNCTION OPERATING ELEMENT | [2004/05] | French: | Volant avec ELEMENT DE REGLAGE POLYVALENT | [2004/05] |
Former [2002/25] | MULTIFUNKTIONS-BEDIENELEMENT | ||
Former [2002/25] | MULTIFUNCTION OPERATING ELEMENT | ||
Former [2002/25] | ELEMENT DE REGLAGE POLYVALENT | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.11.2004 | [2007/35] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5086510 (GUENTHER CLEMENS [DE], et al); | [DA]EP0366132 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]EP0669715 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE19604351 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0796756 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]US5825353 (WILL CRAIG ALEXANDER [US]); | [XY]EP0901262 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) |