EP1212230 - CONTAINER MOVING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gee, Graham 112 Corporation Street Chorley Lancashire PR6 0DN / GB | [2005/36] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Gee, Graham 112 Corporation Street Chorley, Lancashire PR6 0DN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY, West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 00954715.9 | 18.08.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000GB03195 | Priority number, date | GB19990019420 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9919420 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112491 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212230 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212230 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62B1/26 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B62B1/264 (EP,US);
B62B5/0083 (EP,US);
B62B2202/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUM BEWEGEN EINES CONTAINERS | [2002/24] | English: | CONTAINER MOVING APPARATUS | [2002/24] | French: | ENGIN DE TRANSPORT DE CONTENEURS | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.09.2005 | CY | 07.09.2005 | FI | 07.09.2005 | LI | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | SE | 07.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/35] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 07.09.2005 | |
FI | 07.09.2005 | ||
LI | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SE | 07.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2412697 (STANISLAW SOCHACZEWSKI) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-15,17,20-28 * column W *; | [A]FR995125 (M. RAOUL ROBERT) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [X]US3718342 (FREED R) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-15,17,20-28 * the whole document * |