EP1203135 - METHOD OF FABRICATING MUNTIN BARS FOR SIMULATED DIVIDED LITE WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edgetech I.G., Inc. 800 Cochran Avenue Cambridge, OH 43725 / US | [2002/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHERT, Gerhard 1230 Fillup Drive, SE New Philadelphia, OH 44663 / US | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Thomas Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Fleck, Thomas, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00955426.2 | 11.08.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000US21850 | Priority number, date | US19990148842P | 13.08.1999 Original published format: US 148842 P | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112940 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203135 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/66 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
E06B3/6675 (EP,US);
E06B3/6604 (EP,US);
Y10T428/233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SPROSSEN FÜR ISOLIERGLASSCHEIBEN MIT EINGESETZTEM SPROSSENGITTER | [2002/19] | English: | METHOD OF FABRICATING MUNTIN BARS FOR SIMULATED DIVIDED LITE WINDOWS | [2002/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE MENEAUX POUR FENETRES VITREES A DIVISIONS SIMULEES | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3999930 (TELBIZOFF LOUIS E) [X] 38,39,41,42 * column 3, line 27 - line 38 * * column 5, line 26 - line 48 ** figure - *; | [A]US5088307 (COLE RICHARD D [US]) [A] 1,24,49 * column 1, line 9 - line 58 * * figure - *; | [A]US5345743 (BAIER BRUCE A [US]) [A] 1,24,49 * column 1, line 30 - line 55 * * figure - *; | [A]US5678376 (POMA JAMES P [US]) [A] 30 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 11 * * figure - * | Examination | US4567710 | DE4101277 |