EP1212788 - IMPROVED FILL MATERIAL FOR DUAL DAMASCENE PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brewer Science 2401 Brewer Drive Rolla, MO 65402 / US | [2002/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMB, James, E., III 1511 Scenic Drive Rolla, MO 65401 / US | 02 /
SHAO, Xie 25 McFarland Drive Rolla, MO 65401 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00955751.3 | 17.08.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000US22839 | Priority number, date | US19990383785 | 26.08.1999 Original published format: US 383785 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115211 | Date: | 01.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212788 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212788 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302, H01L21/312, H01L21/47, H01L21/66, H01L21/768 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H01L21/76808 (EP,US);
H01L21/28 (KR);
H01L21/02118 (EP);
H01L21/312 (US);
H01L21/02282 (EP);
Y10T428/12556 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/24] | H01L21/302, H01L21/312, H01L21/47, H01L21/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FÜLLMATERIAL FÜR EIN DUAL-DAMASZENE-VERFAHREN | [2002/24] | English: | IMPROVED FILL MATERIAL FOR DUAL DAMASCENE PROCESSES | [2002/24] | French: | MATERIAU DE REMPLISSAGE DESTINE A DES PROCEDES DE DAMASQUINAGE DUAL | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 15.07.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 13.10.2008 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | IE | 17.08.2014 | LU | 17.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/37] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 17.08.2014 | ||
LU | 17.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 17.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 11.06.2014 | |
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 11.06.2014 | |
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4414808 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 61 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 20 * * examples 2,3 * * column 8, line 56 - column 9, line 3 * [A] 12,18-21,25,27-29,34; | [XA]EP0813114 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [X] 1-9,11,14-17 * page 4, line 10 - page 9, line 53; examples 13,14 * [A] 12,18,25-31,33,34; | [A]US5883006 (IBA JUNICHIRO [US]) [A] 1-35 * column 1, line 45 - line 67 * * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 57; figures 1d,2a-h *; | [XA]WO9921058 (BREWER SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11,12,14-17 [A] 18,25,27,29-31,33,34; | [XA]EP0916683 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [X] 1-11,14-16 * page 3, line 14 - page 12, line 10 * * page 13, line 14 * * page 15, line 5 - line 20 * [A] 18-21,25-33; | [X]JPH11162982 (NEC CORP) [X] 1,18 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figures 4,5 *; | [XA]JPH11204638 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11,12,14,15,18-22,24,25,27-29,31,33,34 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0164]; figures 1-7,15,16 * [A] 13,35; | [E]EP1035442 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [E] 1-11,14-17* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4451597 (VICTORIUS CLAUS [US]); | [Y]US4727100 (VASTA JOSEPH A [US]); | [Y]US4981891 (FELTER RICHARD E [US], et al); | [Y]US5283104 (AOUDE FARID Y [US], et al); | [X]US5602198 (DAS SURYYA K [US], et al); | [X]US5859136 (SCOPAZZI CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [AP]US6054254 (SATO YASUHIKO [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP0813114 | US5883006 | WO9921058 | EP0916683 | JPH11162982 | JPH11204638 | EP1035442 |