EP1210228 - INKJET PRINTING DEVICE FOR INKS CONTAINING A HIGH LOADING OF PIGMENT AND INKJET PRINTING PROCESS UTILIZING SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KBA-GIORI S.A. 4, rue de la Paix 1003 Lausanne / CH | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROCKETT, Dennis 72 Westminster Gardens, Eye Peterborough, PE6 7SP / GB | 02 /
HUDD, Alan, L. Bury Cottage Nuthampstead Hertfordshire SG8 8NG / GB | 03 /
EVANS, Christopher, M. 14 Ash Green Great Chesterford Essex CB10 1QR / GB | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2002/23] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Avenue du Théâtre 16 Case postale 2065 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 00956015.2 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000CH00483 | Priority number, date | EP19990810809 | 09.09.1999 Original published format: EP 99810809 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117783 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1210228 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210228 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/195 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
B41J2/18 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKVORRICHTUNG FÜR TINTEN MIT HOHER PIGMENTKONZENTRATION UND DIESE VORRICHTUNG GEBRAUCHENDES TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKVERFAHREN | [2002/23] | English: | INKJET PRINTING DEVICE FOR INKS CONTAINING A HIGH LOADING OF PIGMENT AND INKJET PRINTING PROCESS UTILIZING SAID DEVICE | [2002/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE DESTINE A DES ENCRES CONTENANT UNE GRANDE CHARGE DE PIGMENTS ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION A JET D'ENCRE UTILISANT CE DISPOSITIF | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.04.2003 | DK | 16.04.2003 | FI | 16.04.2003 | NL | 16.04.2003 | GR | 16.07.2003 | PT | 16.07.2003 | CY | 08.09.2003 | IE | 08.09.2003 | LU | 08.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2007/40] |
Former [2005/02] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
FI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 08.09.2003 | ||
IE | 08.09.2003 | ||
LU | 08.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
FI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 08.09.2003 | ||
IE | 08.09.2003 | ||
LU | 08.09.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
FI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 08.09.2003 | ||
LU | 08.09.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
FI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
CY | 08.09.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
FI | 16.04.2003 | ||
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 16.04.2003 | |
NL | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 16.04.2003 | |
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 16.04.2003 | |
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 16.04.2003 | |
PT | 16.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60110458 ; | [A]US4891654 (HOISINGTON PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 4 * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0642924 (MATTHEWS INT CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 23 - column 9, line 14 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0736388 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 4, line 48 - page 5, line 10 * * page 7, line 20 - line 34 * * page 12, line 35 - line 40 * * figures 2,9 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851022), vol. 009, no. 264, Database accession no. (M - 423), & JP60110458 A 19850615 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 7 * abstract * |