EP1194113 - Use of bioactive glass as a preservative for cosmetic and pharmaceutical preparations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/15] | PRESERVATIVES FOR PERISHABLE PREPARATIONS, IN PARTICULAR FOR COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS | ||
[2006/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
AT
CY
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
IE
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kessler, Susanne Johannisweg 23 D-84030 Ergolding / DE | 02 /
LEE, Sean Oberlinstrasse 17 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Fritzsche, Thomas, et al Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Fritzsche, Thomas M., Dr., et al Fuchs, Mehler, Weiss & Fritzsche Naupliastrasse 110 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00956075.6 | 07.07.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000DE02231 | Priority number, date | DE1999132239 | 09.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19932239 | [2002/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0103650 | Date: | 18.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1194113 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1194113 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61K8/21, A61K8/24, A61K8/25, A61Q1/02, A61Q19/00, C03C4/00, C03C3/097, C03C3/11 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
A61Q1/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/21 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C03C3/076 (KR);
C03C3/097 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | A61K8/19, A61K8/21, A61K8/24, A61K8/25, A61Q1/02, A61Q1/04, A61Q19/00, A61K33/06, A61K33/12, C03C4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/15] | A61K7/027, A61K7/02, A61K33/06, A61K33/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von bioaktivem Glas zur Konservierung von kosmetischen und pharmazeutischen Präparaten | [2010/24] | English: | Use of bioactive glass as a preservative for cosmetic and pharmaceutical preparations | [2010/24] | French: | Utilisation d'un verre bioactif en tant qu'agent conservateur pour préparations cosmétiques et pharmaceutiques | [2010/24] |
Former [2002/15] | KONSERVIERUNGSMITTEL FÜR VERDERBLICHE PRÄPARATE, INSBESONDERE FÜR KOSMETISCHE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN | ||
Former [2002/15] | PRESERVATIVES FOR PERISHABLE PREPARATIONS, IN PARTICULAR FOR COSMETIC AND PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATIONS | ||
Former [2002/15] | AGENT CONSERVATEUR DESTINE A DES PREPARATIONS PERISSABLES, NOTAMMENT DES PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES ET PHARMACEUTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 11.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 12.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 20.11.2006 | Appeal received No. T0315/07 | 31.01.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 11.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | IE | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | AT | 07.07.2011 | LU | 07.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/07] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
AT | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 09.03.2011 | |
GR | 10.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0395516 ; | [X]JPH10139644 ; | [X]US4155870 (JORGENSEN JENS L [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * claims 1,3,5,6 * * example 1 *; | [X]WO9624364 (GILTECH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * claims 1,2,9 * * page 4, lines 5-32 *; | [DX]US5766611 (SHIMONO FUJIO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-9 * claims 1,2,4-6,8,12-14 * * column 5, lines 1-5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910715), vol. 0152, no. 78, & JP03095516 A 19910419 (ADVANCE) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10139644 A 19980526 (SUNSTAR) [X] 1,5,8 * abstract * | Examination | US5074916 | WO9727148 | WO0076486 | - HENCH L.L., "Bioceramics: From Concept to Clinic", J. AM. CERAM. SOC., MALDEN, MA, US, (199107), vol. 74, no. 7, pages 1487 - 1510, XP002090879 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1991.tb07132.x |