12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
22.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
24.11.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
13.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
06.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
22.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
02.12.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] |
22.11.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.11.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.01.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.01.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2003 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2003 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
02.09.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.04.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] |
15.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.02.2003 |
First examination report |
|
27.09.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.04.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
12.04.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
20.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|