Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4895451B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2012 | B2 | JP2003505567 | 12.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0007274 | 25.07.2000 | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6831400 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0007274 | 25.07.2000 | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1208149 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2006 | B1 | EP1208149 | 29.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0007274 | 25.07.2000 | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60025619T | 23.11.2006 | T2 | DE60025619D1 | 06.04.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0007274 | 25.07.2000 | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6797788 | 28.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP0007274 | 25.07.2000 | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0107512 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE316115T | 15.02.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1012800 | 06.03.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2257311T | 01.08.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE9900510 | 27.07.1999 |