EP1208149 - THERMOPLASTIC ALIPHATIC POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS, PREPARATION METHOD AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAEYS, Ivan L. Van Beethovenlaan 7 B-3191 Boortmeerbeek / BE | 02 /
WAUTIER, Henri 19, rue Louis Catala B-7090 Braine-Le-Comte / BE | 03 /
MANFREDI, Dino Wittebroodhof 30 B-9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2002/22] | Dufrasne, Eugène, et al Solvay S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle, 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 00956330.5 | 25.07.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP07274 | Priority number, date | BE19990000510 | 27.07.1999 Original published format: BE 9900510 | [2002/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0107512 | Date: | 01.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208149 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208149 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/14, C08L67/04, // C08L67:04, C08L67:04 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/14, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/04, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/03] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE ALIPHATISCHE POLYESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2002/22] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC ALIPHATIC POLYESTER COMPOSITIONS, PREPARATION METHOD AND USES THEREOF | [2002/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYESTERS ALIPHATIQUES THERMOPLASTIQUES, PROCEDE POUR LEUR PREPARATION ET UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | LU | 25.07.2006 | CH | 31.07.2006 | LI | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
LU | 25.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0443270 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-16* page 3, line 31 - line 45; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9518169 (NESTE OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 6; claims 1-22 *; | [A]US5798435 (GRUBER PATRICK RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * claims 1,13 *; | [X] - CAVALLARO P ET AL, "REACTIVE BLENDING OF BIOAFFINE POLYESTERS THROUGH FREE-RADICAL PROCESSES", ANGEWANDTE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE. APPLIED MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH,WEINHEIM, (19930801), vol. 210, ISSN 0003-3146, pages 129 - 141, XP000396026 [X] 1-5,7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/apmc.1993.052100110 |