EP1312225 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE PROVISION OF SERVICES OVER DIFFERENT NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURET, Christophe, Nokia Research Center PL 422 FIN-0045 Nokia Group / FI | 02 /
KINNUNEN, Jari, Nokia Research Center PL 422 FIN-0045 Nokia Group / FI | 03 /
KUISMANEN, Pekka, Nokia Research Center PL 422 FIN-0045 Nokia Group / FI | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00956457.6 | 16.08.2000 | [2003/21] | WO2000EP08009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0215598 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312225 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/4604 (EP);
H04L41/5054 (EP);
H04L67/04 (EP);
H04L67/14 (EP);
H04L67/51 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04Q3/0054 (EP);
H04Q3/0062 (EP);
H04L67/568 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERGEBEN VON DIENSTEN ÜBER VERSCHIEDENE NETZWERKE | [2003/21] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE PROVISION OF SERVICES OVER DIFFERENT NETWORKS | [2003/21] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT LA FOURNITURE DE SERVICES SUR DIFFERENTS RESEAUX | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0042760 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-6,8-14,16-18 * abstract * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 4 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 15 * * page 12, line 19 - line 22 ** page 38, line 3 - line 7; claims 16,19 * |