EP1224355 - USE OF A FLEECE AS HEEL LINING FOR USE IN THE SHOE INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/30] | HEEL LINING FOR USE IN THE SHOE INDUSTRY | ||
[2004/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2002/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Rudolf Bugginger Strasse 14 79379 Müllheim / DE | 02 /
GROTEN, Robert 20, rue de l'1l F-68280 Sundhofen / FR | [2002/30] | Application number, filing date | 00956508.6 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/30] | WO2000EP08547 | Priority number, date | DE1999147870 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19947870 | [2002/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0125529 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1224355 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1224355 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D06N7/00, A43B23/16, D04H3/12, D04H3/10, D04H3/16, D06N3/14 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
D04H3/016 (EP);
D04H3/009 (EP,KR);
A43B23/07 (EP);
A43B23/16 (EP);
D04H3/011 (EP);
D04H3/11 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/30] | Extension states | LT | 08.03.2002 | LV | 08.03.2002 | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES VLIESSTOFFES ALS FERSENFUTTER FÜR DIE SCHUHINDUSTRIE | [2004/20] | English: | USE OF A FLEECE AS HEEL LINING FOR USE IN THE SHOE INDUSTRY | [2004/20] | French: | USAGE D'UNE TOISON COMME DOUBLURE DE TALON POUR L'INDUSTRIE DE LA CHAUSSURE | [2004/20] |
Former [2002/30] | FERSENFUTTER FÜR DIE SCHUHINDUSTRIE | ||
Former [2002/30] | HEEL LINING FOR USE IN THE SHOE INDUSTRY | ||
Former [2002/30] | DOUBLURE DE TALON POUR L'INDUSTRIE DE LA CHAUSSURE | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 20.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | ES | 14.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3829351 (CLOSSON A, et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US4107374 (KUSUNOSE TETSUHIRO, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4147574 (SETSUIE TAKASHI, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5164240 (BURGESS KENNETH W [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [X]US5899785 (GROTEN ROBERT [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,9,12 * column 2, line 62 - page 3, line 5; examples 3,4; claim - * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 26 *; | [X]WO9924658 (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,9,12 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0952250 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,5,9,12 * page 4, paragraph 17 * * page 5, paragraph 19 - page 7, paragraph 28 *; | [A] - "Nouveaux cuirs synthétiques japonais", INDUSTRIE TEXTILE,FR,INDUSTRIE TEXTILE. PARIS, (19940601), no. 1255/1256, ISSN 0019-9176, page 63, XP000506756 [A] 1-16 * column 1 * |