EP1203047 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYMERS CAPABLE OF BEING COVALENTLY GRAFTED ON BY LIGHT, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND USES AS SUPPORTS IN PROBES FOR SPECIFIC IDENTIFICATION IN ELECTRONIC BIOSENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE JOSEPH FOURIER, UJF-INDUSTRIE Batiment Administration des Sciences, B.P. 53 F-38041 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states UNIVERSITE JOSEPH FOURIER, UJF-INDUSTRIE Batiment Administration des Sciences, B.P. 53 F-38041 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSNIER, Serge 176, Rue Dian Fossey F-38920 Crolles / FR | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Sarlin, Laure V., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Sarlin, Laure V., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès, BP 7073 69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/19] | Thibault, Jean-Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00956636.5 | 07.08.2000 | [2002/19] | WO2000FR02267 | Priority number, date | FR19990010535 | 12.08.1999 Original published format: FR 9910535 | FR19990015022 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: FR 9915022 | [2002/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112699 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203047 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203047 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G83/00, C12Q1/68, C07D207/32, C07D209/16, C07C235/84 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
C07D207/333 (EP,US);
C07C235/84 (EP,US);
C07D207/335 (EP,US);
C07D209/16 (EP,US);
C08G61/122 (EP,US);
C12Q1/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/19] | Title | German: | PHOTO-PFROPFUNGS-ELEKTROPOLYMERE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS TRÄGER FÜR ERKENNUNGSSONDEN SPEZIFISCH IN BIOSENSORSYSTEMEN | [2002/19] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYMERS CAPABLE OF BEING COVALENTLY GRAFTED ON BY LIGHT, METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME AND USES AS SUPPORTS IN PROBES FOR SPECIFIC IDENTIFICATION IN ELECTRONIC BIOSENSORS | [2002/19] | French: | ELECTROPOLYMERES PHOTOGREFFABLES, LEUR PROCEDE D'OBTENTION ET LEURS APPLICATIONS COMME SUPPORTS DE SONDES DE RECONNAISSANCE SPECIFIQUE DANS DES BIOCAPTEURS ELECTRONIQUES | [2002/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 09.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | IE | 09.01.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | LU | 07.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
LU | 07.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02255716 ; | [A]JPH0776572 ; | [DA]WO9010655 (ALLAGE ASSOCIATES INC [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,2,13,14 *; | [DA]WO9529199 (BIO MERIEUX [FR], et al) [DA] 1* claims 1,2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 47, Database accession no. 1990-352848, XP002139597 & JPH02255716 A 19901016 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 20, Database accession no. 1995-151827, XP002139598 & JPH0776572 A 19950320 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |