EP1125585 - TREATMENT OF GRAFT-VERSUS-HOST DISEASE TARGETING AILIM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/34] | REMEDIES FOR IMMUNOLOGICAL DISEASES | ||
[2010/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2011/30] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEZUKA, Katsunari Pha. Frontier Res.Lab. of Japan Tobacco, Inc., 1-13-2, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Yoshihiro, Pha. Frontier Res. Lab. of Japan Tobacco, Inc., 1-13-2, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
ABE, Ryo 869-17, Higashifukai Nagareyama-shi, Chiba 270-0101 / JP | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/34] | 01 /
TEZUKA, Katsunari Pha. Frontier Res.Lab. of Japan Tobacco, Inc., 1-13-2, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagaw / JP | ||
02 /
WATANABE, Yoshihiro, Pha. Frontier Res. Lab. of Japan Tobacco, Inc., 1-13-2, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagaw / JP | |||
03 /
ABE, Ryo 869-17, Higashifukai Nagareyama-shi, Chiba 270-0101 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00956800.7 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/34] | WO2000JP05868 | Priority number, date | JP19990242672 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24267299 | JP20000254680 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000254680 | [2001/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115732 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1125585 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125585 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P37/06 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | A61K45/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | 17.05.2001 | LT | 17.05.2001 | LV | 17.05.2001 | MK | 17.05.2001 | RO | 17.05.2001 | SI | 17.05.2001 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG DER TRANSPLANTAT-GEGEN-EMPFÄNGER-KRANKHEIT MIT AILIM ALS ZIEL | [2011/30] | English: | TREATMENT OF GRAFT-VERSUS-HOST DISEASE TARGETING AILIM | [2010/41] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA RÉACTION DE GREFFE CONTRE HÔTE EN CIBLANT AILIM | [2010/41] |
Former [2001/34] | BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN DES IMMUNSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2001/34] | REMEDIES FOR IMMUNOLOGICAL DISEASES | ||
Former [2001/34] | TRAITEMENTS DE MALADIES IMMUNITAIRES | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2001 | Translation filed | 17.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 10.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2011 | BE | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | IT | 27.07.2011 | NL | 27.07.2011 | SE | 27.07.2011 | IE | 30.08.2011 | LU | 30.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 30.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 30.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 27.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9830232 (ROBARTS JOHN P RES INST [CA], et al) [Y] 1-3,9-12 * page 7, line 5 - line 21; claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO9852606 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 6-8 * page 19 - page 26 *; | [PX]EP0984023 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [PX] 1-3,9-12 * page 4, paragraph 26 - paragraph 27; claim 33 * * paragraph [0286] *; | [Y] - HUTLOFF ANDREAS ET AL, "ICOS is an inducible T-cell co-stimulator-structurally and functionally related to CD28", NATURE (LONDON), (19990121), vol. 397, no. 6716, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 263 - 266, XP002156736 [Y] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/16717 | [T] - NURIEVA ROZA I ET AL, "Inducible costimulator is essential for collagen-induced arthritis.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION. MAR 2003, (200303), vol. 111, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 701 - 706, XP002336752 [T] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI17321 | [T] - IWAI HIDEYUKI ET AL, "Amelioration of collagen-induced arthritis by blockade of inducible costimulator-B7 homologous protein costimulation.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 OCT 2002, (20021015), vol. 169, no. 8, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4332 - 4339, XP002336753 [T] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document * | [A] - FABRIS C ET AL, "RELATIONSHIP AMONG HEPATIC INFLAMMATORY CHANGES, CIRCULATING LEVELSOF CYTOKINES, AND RESPONSE TO IFN-ALPHA IN CHRONIC HEPATITIS C", JOURNAL OF INTERFERON AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1998), vol. 18, no. 9, ISSN 1079-9907, pages 705 - 709, XP000929124 [A] 4,5 * abstract * | [T] - OZKAYNAK E ET AL, "Importance of ICOS-B7RP-1 costimulation in acute and chronic allograft rejection.", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY JUL 2001, (200107), vol. 2, no. 7, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 591 - 596, XP008019252 [T] 6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/89731 | [T] - NANJI S A ET AL, "Combination therapy with anti-ICOS and cyclosporine enhances cardiac but not islet allograft survival", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (200311), vol. 35, no. 7, ISSN 0041-1345, pages 2477 - 2478, XP002288913 [T] 6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.transproceed.2003.08.029 | International search | [X]WO9838216 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al); | [X]WO9915553 (BUNDESREPUBLIK DEUTSCHLAND LET [DE], et al) | by applicant | - CELL, (1998), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 343 - 346 |