EP1316551 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING EPOXY COMPOUNDS, AROMATIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE COMPOUNDS, AND DRINKS, PERFUMES, COSMETICS, CIGARETTES, AND TOBACCOS CONTAINING THE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SODA AROMATIC COMPANY, LIMITED 15-9, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states SODA AROMATIC COMPANY, LIMITED 15-9, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Nobuhiko Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. Noda Branch 1573-4, Funakata Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP | 02 /
HIGASHI, Motoo Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. Noda Branch 1573-4, Funakata Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP | 03 /
KONNO, Yuki Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. Noda Branch 1573-4, Funakata Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP | 04 /
TAKAOKA, H. Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. Noda Branch 1573-4, Funakata Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00956902.1 | 04.09.2000 | [2003/23] | WO2000JP05987 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0220504 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316551 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D303/04, C07D301/26, A61K7/46, A23L1/226 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C07D303/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D301/26 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/56 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/203 (EP,US);
A23L27/205 (KR);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/33 (EP,US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EPOXYVERBINDUNGEN, DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, UND DIESE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTENDE GETRÄNKE, PARFUMS, KOSMETIKA, ZIGARETTEN UND TABAK | [2003/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING EPOXY COMPOUNDS, AROMATIC COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE COMPOUNDS, AND DRINKS, PERFUMES, COSMETICS, CIGARETTES, AND TOBACCOS CONTAINING THE COMPOSITIONS | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES EPOXY, COMPOSITION AROMATIQUE CONTENANT CES COMPOSES, ET BOISSONS, PARFUMS, COSMETIQUES, CIGARETTES ET TABACS CONTENANT CES COMPOSITIONS | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2002 | Translation filed | 30.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 12.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1315438 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5129455 (KOJIN KK); | [A]JPS523837 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD); | [A]JPS4947345 |