EP1232753 - STABLE PROTEIN SOLUTION FILLED IN A CONTAINER MADE FROM A HYDROPHOBIC RESIN AND METHOD OF STABILIZING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/34] | PROTEIN SOLUTION PREPARATION AND METHOD OF STABILIZING THE SAME | ||
[2007/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | [2008/12] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo, 115-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Nobuyuki Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 02 /
MITSUI, Naoki Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 03 /
HIRAISHI, Takaya Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Yoshirou Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00957046.6 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000JP06144 | Priority number, date | JP19990254896 | 08.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25489699 | [2002/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117542 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232753 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232753 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/22, A61K38/16, A61K9/08, A61K9/10, A61K47/32 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/33] | A61K38/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/10, A61K47/32 | ||
Former IPC [2002/34] | A61K38/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILE PROTEINLÖSUNG ABGEFÜLLT IN EINEM BEHÄLTNIS AUS HYDROPHOBEM HARZ UND EINE METHODE ZUR STABILISIERUNG DERSELBEN | [2007/36] | English: | STABLE PROTEIN SOLUTION FILLED IN A CONTAINER MADE FROM A HYDROPHOBIC RESIN AND METHOD OF STABILIZING THE SAME | [2007/36] | French: | SOLUTION DE PROTÉINE STABLE CONTENUE DANS DES RÉCIPIENTS À BASE DE RÉSINE HYDROPHOBE ET PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION ASSOCIÉ | [2007/36] |
Former [2002/34] | ZUBEREITUNG EINER PROTEINLÖSUNG UND METHODE ZÜR STABILISIERUNG DERSELBEN | ||
Former [2002/34] | PROTEIN SOLUTION PREPARATION AND METHOD OF STABILIZING THE SAME | ||
Former [2002/34] | PREPARATION DE SOLUTION DE PROTEINES ET PROCEDE DE STABILISATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2002 | Translation filed | 14.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IT | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | IE | 08.09.2008 | LU | 08.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 08.09.2008 | ||
LU | 08.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 08.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 08.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 08.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 08.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0524802 (DAIKYO GOMU SEIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-12,18-20 * page 2, lines 1-5 * * page 4, lines 32-34,50-57 * * page 5, line 4 - page 10, line 58 * * page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 6 *; | [X]EP0858809 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]) [X] 1,2,17-20 * page 2, lines 5-11,45-50 * * page 4, lines 32,33 *; | [X]EP0879611 (DAIKYO SEIKO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,12-14,18-20 * page 2, lines 5-9,32-34 * * page 3, lines 46-52 * * page 5, lines 1-4,17-21 ** page 7, lines 45-56; table 7 *; | [X]EP0909564 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,12-15,18-20 * page 2, paragraphs 1,7,9 * * page 3, paragraphs 11,19 * | International search | [X]JPS54135215 (SS PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [Y]GB2193631 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [Y]WO8901791 (ASTRA MEDITEC AB [SE]); | [Y]JPH0296533 (TOYO JOZO KK); | [Y]US4992419 (WOOG HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [X]EP0490549 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]EP0556034 (DAIKYO GOMU SEIKO KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0559146 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]); | [X]EP0576294 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO9638503 (SOLVAY [BE], et al); | [Y]JPH11146910 (TERANO MINORU, et al); | [XP]JP2000044487 (TAIYO PHARMA IND) |