EP1227434 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | [2006/45] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGI, Katsutoshi Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Takashi Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Glawe. Delfs. Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00957077.1 | 08.09.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000JP06178 | Priority number, date | JP19990290420 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29042099 | [2002/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0127869 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227434 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227434 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.04.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00, H01P1/212, H01Q7/00, H04B5/02, H04B7/00, G06K19/00 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
G06K19/07771 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/245 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
H01Q1/52 (EP,US);
H01Q1/526 (EP,US);
H01Q17/001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | G06K17/00, H01P1/212, H01Q7/00, H04B5/02, H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2002/31] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2002/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2002 | Translation filed | 30.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11168286 ; | [A]JPH09181522 ; | [A]JPH05184087 ; | [A]GB2288103 (HUGHES MICROELECTRONICS EUROPA [GB]); | [A]US5557279 (D HONT LOEK [NL]) | International search | [Y]JPH01258191 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05184087 (CANADA); | [Y]JPH06283918 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH07142917 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH11163579 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11238103 (DENSO CORP) |