18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
21.01.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
03.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
30.01.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
17.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
28.06.2003 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.06.2003 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
11.04.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
19.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
12.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.2002 |
First examination report |
|
03.05.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.05.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
29.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|