Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0153720 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005022612 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003520341 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003509638 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1250543 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2005 | B1 | EP1250543 | 23.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6880100 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3247601 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1214533 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2004 | B1 | EP1214533 | 19.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE262122T | 15.04.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE292258T | 15.04.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1196873C | 13.04.2005 | C | CN1398329 | 19.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60009100T | 02.12.2004 | T2 | DE60009100D1 | 22.04.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60109744T | 23.02.2006 | T2 | DE60109744D1 | 04.05.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1050391 | 20.05.2005 | B | HK1050391 | 20.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1052544 | 19.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL0100009 | 09.01.2001 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL1013046C | 16.03.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL1014153C | 25.07.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6884198 | 26.04.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | NL0000594 | 25.08.2000 | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0120193 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1166876C | 15.09.2004 | C | CN1373839 | 09.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2218208T | 16.11.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL1014505C | 16.03.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1214533E | 30.07.2004 | E | Priority number | Date | NL1014505 | 25.02.2000 | NL1014153 | 24.01.2000 | NL1013046 | 15.09.1999 |