EP1214814 - EXTENSIBLE POLICY-BASED NETWORK MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUTZOLU, David, M. 1811 Sequoia Court Forest Grove, OR 97116 / US | 02 /
YAVATKAR, Rajendra 17134 NW Countryridge Portland, OR 97229 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/25] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn London WC2A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00957591.1 | 18.08.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000US22792 | Priority number, date | US19990393138 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: US 393138 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0119031 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214814 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
H04L41/0803 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/0894 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGELBASIERENDE NETZWERKVERWALTUNG MIT ERWEITERBARER ARCHITEKTUR | [2002/25] | English: | EXTENSIBLE POLICY-BASED NETWORK MANAGEMENT ARCHITECTURE | [2002/25] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE GESTION DE RESEAU A BASE DE REGLES EXTENSIBLE | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA] - M. FERIDUN, W. KASTELEIJN, J. KRAUSE, "Distributed Management with Mobile Components", IBM RESEARCH REPORT RZ3102, IBM RESEARCH DIVISION, ZURICH RESEARCH LABORATORY, (199902), pages 857 - 870, XP002158233 [Y] 1-8,13-17,22,23 * abstract * * pag 858, third paragraph * * pag 860, 3. Distributed Management Framework * * pag 861 * * pag 866-867, 4. Implementation Example * * pag 867, 4.2 The monitoring service MC * [A] 9,18,24 | [YDA] - J. BOYLE, R. COHEN, D. DURHAM, S. HERZOG, R. RAJAN, A. SASTRY, "The COPS (Common Open Policy Service) Protocol", IETF DRAFT VERSION 0.7, (19990816), URL: ftp://ftp.sonycsl.co.jp/mirror/ftp.iij.ad.jp/internet-drafts/draft-ietf-rap-cops-07.txt, (20010123), XP002158234 [YD] 1-8,13-17,22,23 * 1.Introduction * * 3. Message Content * * 3.1 Request * * 3.2 Decision * * 4.5 Configuration Operations * [A] 9,18,24 | [A] - D. HYDE, "Web Based Management", 3COM TECHNICAL PAPERS, (199703), URL: http://www.3com.com/nsc/500627.html, (20010123), XP002158235 [A] 1,6,9,13,18,22-24 * page 4, column 1, paragraph L * | [A] - M. BALDI, S. GAI, G. PICCO, "Exploiting Code Mobility in Decentralized and Flexible Network management"", PRTOC. MOBILE AGENTS '97, Berlin, Germany, (199704), URL: http://citeseer.nj.nec.com/baldi-exploiting.html, (20010123), XP002158236 [A] 1,6,9,13,18,22-24 * figure 2 * * section 3, subsection "Code on demand" * pag 8, lines 12-13 * * section 4, subsection "Code on Demand" * |