EP1212128 - SAMPLE PREPARATION FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scynexis Chemistry and Automation, Inc. 3501-C Tricenter Boulevard Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2002/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABEDI, Jaleh 2601 Sunnystone Way Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar Albihns Göteborg AB, Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00957766.9 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000US23245 | Priority number, date | US19990150995P | 27.08.1999 Original published format: US 150995 P | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0115793 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212128 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B01D15/12 (EP,US);
B01D15/16 (EP,US);
B01D15/203 (EP,US);
B01D15/424 (EP,US);
B01D15/163 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00452 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00587 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00707 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0072 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00759 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENPREPARATION ZUR REINIGUNG MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ | [2002/24] | English: | SAMPLE PREPARATION FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT PURIFICATION | [2002/24] | French: | PREPARATION D'ECHANTILLONS POUR PURIFICATION A GRAND DEBIT | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0467665 (DORR OLIVER INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]EP0501786 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* example 1 *; | [A]US5210226 (PANDEY RAMESH C [US]) [A] 1 * example 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | - J.CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1980), vol. 192, pages 222 - 227 | - J.LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1981), vol. 4, pages 661 - 680 | - J.CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1982), vol. 249, pages 193 - 198 |