EP1295403 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR START-UP PROCEDURE FOR DIGITAL AND ANALOG MODEMS UTILIZING PCM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Capital Corporation 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk Connecticut / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC CAPITAL CORPORATION 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut / US | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHRABANZAD, Sepehr 25 Overlook Drive Southborough, MA 01772 / US | 02 /
KIM, Dae-young 6231 Lexington Ridge Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 03 /
PILOZZI, John 73 Messenger Street No.121 Plainville, MA 02762 / US | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00957811.3 | 25.08.2000 | [2003/13] | WO2000US23399 | Priority number, date | US19990390106 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: US 390106 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0118982 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1295403 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14, H04L25/49 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
H04L5/1438 (EP,US);
H04M11/06 (KR);
H04L25/4927 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | H04B1/38, H03H7/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | 03.04.2002 | LT | 03.04.2002 | LV | 03.04.2002 | MK | 03.04.2002 | RO | 03.04.2002 | SI | 03.04.2002 | Title | German: | STARTVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIGITALE UND ANALOGE PCM-MODEMS | [2003/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR START-UP PROCEDURE FOR DIGITAL AND ANALOG MODEMS UTILIZING PCM | [2003/13] | French: | PROCEDURE DE DEMARRAGE DE MODEMS NUMERIQUES ET ANALOGIQUES UTILISANT LA MODULATION MIC : PROCEDE ET APPAREIL A CET EFFET | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 04.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5007047 (SRIDHAR MANICKAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, line 10 - line 47 *; | [XY]US5887027 (COHEN HERBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 37 * * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]WO9934565 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 27 * * page 11, line 14 - line 27 * * page 15, line 8 - line 24 * * page 16, line 11 - line 21; figures 9-11,13 * [Y] 3; | [XY]WO9934566 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 17 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 5 - line 16 * * page 10, line 8 - line 21 * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 12; figures 1,2,7 * [Y] 4; | [A] - "A MODEM OPERATING AT DATA SIGNALLING RATES OF UP TO 33600 BIT/S FORUSE ON THE GENERAL SWITCHED TELEPHONE NETWORK AND ON LEASED POINT-TO-POINT 2-WIRE TELEPHONE-TYPE CIRCUITS", DRAFT RECOMMENDATION V.34, XX, XX, (199811), no. V 34, pages 15 - 31, XP002927872 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4884285 (HEYNEN JAN [CA], et al); | [X]US5463661 (MORAN III JOHN L [US], et al); | [A]US5475711 (BETTS WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [A]US5754594 (BETTS WILLIAM LEWIS [US], et al); | [A]US5801695 (TOWNSHEND BRENT [US]); | [A]US5835538 (TOWNSHEND BRENT [US]); | [A]US5875229 (EYUBOGLU M VEDAT [US], et al); | [AP]US6052412 (RUETHER PETER GADE [US], et al); | [A] - PEIRRE A. HUMBLET ET AL., "The information driveway", INSTITUT EURECOM, (199510), pages 1 - 23, XP002933704 | [A] - AL CHAME, "A digital signal processor yields enhanced data/fax pump", IEEE AEROSPACE CONF. PROC., (1997), vol. 4, pages 115 - 128, XP002933705 |