EP1198893 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE GENERATION OF A RATE COMPATIBLE CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael St.-Martin-Strasse 44 A D-81541 München / DE | 02 /
KELLA, Tideya Tumblingerstrasse 54/42 D-80337 München / DE | 03 /
DOETSCH, Markus Haselholzweg 26 CH-3098 Schliern / CH | 04 /
JUNG, Peter Im Rabental 28 D-67697 Otterberg / DE | 05 /
PLECHINGER, Jörg Westermühlstrasse 16 D-80469 München / DE | 06 /
SCHMIDT, Peter Bahnhofstrasse 32 D-67167 Erpolzheim / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Lange, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Lange, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00958126.5 | 14.07.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000DE02302 | Priority number, date | DE1999135785 | 29.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19935785 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110041 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198893 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198893 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/29, H03M13/35, H03M13/27, H04L1/00 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/0059 (EP,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04B7/264 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/07] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES RATENKOMPATIBLEN CODES | [2002/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE GENERATION OF A RATE COMPATIBLE CODE | [2002/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR GENERER UN CODE A DEBIT COMPATIBLE | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5414738 (BIENZ RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 2,10,11 * column 15, line 54 - column 16, line 48 *; | [Y]WO9907076 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC [KR]) [Y] 8 * page 1, lines 4-21 *; | [X]WO9844638 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0980148 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [PX] 1,2,9,10,12 * column 8, lines 10-35 * | [XY] - MATSUOKA H ET AL, "ADAPTIVE MODULATION SYSTEM WITH VARIABLE CODING RATE CONCATENATED CODE FOR HIGH QUALITY MULTI-MEDIA COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19960428), vol. CONF. 46, ISBN 0-7803-3158-3, pages 487 - 491, XP000594323 [X] 1,3-6,9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,7,8,10,11,13 | [Y] - CYGAN D ET AL, "A CONCATENATED TWO-STAGE ADAPTIVE (CTSA) ERROR CONTROL SCHEME FOR DATA STRANSMISSION IN TIME-VARYING CHANNELS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19950201), vol. 43, no. 2/04, PART 02, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 795 - 803, XP000502588 [Y] 7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.380111 | [Y] - BENEDETTO S ET AL, "ANALYSIS, DESIGN, AND ITERATIVE DECODING OF DOUBLE SERIALLY CONCATENATED CODES WITH INTERLEAVERS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19980201), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 231 - 244, XP000741777 [Y] 13 * Seite 232, Abbildung 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.661111 |