EP1200043 - SUNSCREEN AGENTS COMPRISING ALCOXYLATED CARBON ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/18] | SUNSCREEN AGENTS | ||
[2002/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGERS, Anke Fürstenwall 137 40215 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KAWA, Rolf Fontanestrasse 28 40789 Monheim / DE | [2002/18] | Application number, filing date | 00958318.8 | 28.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000EP07326 | Priority number, date | DE1999137299 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937299 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0110390 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1200043 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200043 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/068 (EP);
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/11] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL ENTHALTEND ALKOXYLIERTE CARBONSÄUREESTER | [2002/33] | English: | SUNSCREEN AGENTS COMPRISING ALCOXYLATED CARBON ACIDS | [2002/33] | French: | PRODUIT DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE COMPRENANT DES ACIDES CARBONIQUES ALCOXYLIQUES | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/18] | SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL ALKOXYLIERTE CARBONSÄUREESTER ENTHALTEND | ||
Former [2002/18] | SUNSCREEN AGENTS | ||
Former [2002/18] | PRODUIT DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2617817 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0895776 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1,2,6 * examples 8,11,12 *; | [Y]EP0661043 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, line 19 - line 51; table 1 *; | [Y]WO9909943 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0813861 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19641274 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5916541 (STEWART ERNEST G [US]) [A] 1-9 * claims 3,5,9,14 *; | [A]DE3824999 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-9 * example -; claims 1,7,14,15 *; | SU1738284 [ ] (AEROZOL NPOB [SU], et al); | [A]US5220046 (LEACH BRUCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 12 - line 13 * | [A] - KLOKOVA, GALINA I. ET AL., "A composition for protecting hair against ultra-violet radiation", STN INTERNATIONAL; FILE CAPLUS, AN1993:260694, (19930628), XP002156953 [A] 1-9 * abstract * |