EP1204472 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ESTERS FROM UNSATURATED CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND POLYHYDRIC ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIES, Matthias Dahlienstrasse 26 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
STALBERG, Theo Robert-Koch-Strasse 43 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
RÖSSLER, Harald Leinenweberweg 21 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
GUTSCHE, Bernhard Kalstert 96 D-40724 Hilden / DE | [2002/20] | Application number, filing date | 00958367.5 | 03.08.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000EP07496 | Priority number, date | DE1999137911 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937911 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112315 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204472 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204472 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/18, B01J19/26, B01J14/00, C07C67/08, C07C69/54 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/54 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/08, C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C07C67/54, C07C69/54 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2003/05] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ESTERN AUS UNGESÄTTIGTEN CARBONSÄUREN UND MEHRWERTIGEN ALKOHOLEN | [2002/20] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ESTERS FROM UNSATURATED CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND POLYHYDRIC ALCOHOLS | [2002/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ESTERS A PARTIR D'ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES NON SATURES ET D'ALCOOLS POLYVALENTS | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5883288 (IFFLAND GABRIELE [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 6, line 40 - column 11, line 67; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0916643 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, column 57 - page 4, column 55; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0713857 (LUCKY LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0850954 (CP TECH S R L [IT]) [A] 6-9 * figure 1 * |