EP1230175 - METHOD FOR TREATING WASTE WATER IN A BIOLOGICAL SEWAGE PLANT AND DEVICE APPROPRIATE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | [2006/49] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
GB
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | |||
For all designated states WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | |||
Former [2006/13] | For:DE
GB
Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | |||
For all designated states WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | |||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Messer Group GmbH Otto-Volger-Strasse 3c 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
For all designated states WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | |||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Air Liquide Deutschland GmbH Hans-Günther-Sohl-Strasse 5 40235 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | |||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Messer Griesheim GmbH Fritz-Klatte-Strasse 6 65933 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | |||
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH Frankfurt Airport Center 1, C9, Hugo-Eckener-Ring 60547 Frankfurt / DE | ||
For all designated states WEDECO Umwelttechnologie GmbH Boschstrasse 6 32051 Herford / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANS, Monica Am Römerweg 23 D-41470 Neuss / DE | 02 /
Dietrich, Anja-Maria Volmerswerther Strasse 273 D-40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
RIED, Achim Siedlerstrasse 3 D-32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 04 /
PETERS, Birgit Am Pfingstborn 72 D-55262 Heidesheim / DE | [2004/45] |
Former [2002/33] | 01 /
HERMANS, Monica Am Römerweg 23 D-41470 Neuss / DE | ||
02 /
BROMBACH, Anja Langenbeckstrasse 48 D-45130 Essen / DE | |||
03 /
RIED, Achim Siedlerstrasse 3 D-32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | |||
04 /
PETERS, Birgit Am Pfingstborn 72 D-55262 Heidesheim / DE | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/06] | Lenzing, Andreas, Dr., et al Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00958517.5 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000EP08479 | Priority number, date | DE1999142184 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942184 | [2002/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117917 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230175 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230175 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/00, C02F1/78 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
C02F3/1221 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F11/00 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABWASSER IN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN KLÄRANLAGE UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETE VORRICHTUNG | [2002/33] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING WASTE WATER IN A BIOLOGICAL SEWAGE PLANT AND DEVICE APPROPRIATE THEREFOR | [2002/33] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX USEES DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE CLARIFICATION BIOLOGIQUE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IE | 23.08.2006 | AT | 31.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | LU | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | PT | 24.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 31.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
LU | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 31.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 31.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
PT | 24.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
SE | 23.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0881195 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,12 * column 5, paragraph 5; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2766813 (DEGREMONT [FR]) [A] 1-16* figures 1-9 *; | [XY]EP0903325 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-11,14,16 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0015] , [0018]; table 3 * [Y] 8,10; | [YA]EP0924168 (SHINKO PANTEC KABUSHIKA KAISHA [JP]) [Y] 8,10 * paragraphs [0020] , [0035] , [0045]; figures 1-3,7 * [A] 1 |