EP1143835 - DELIVERY BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hollming Oy PL 14 26101 Rauma / FI | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALO, Risto Kuusistonkatu 12 FIN-26100 Rauma / FI | 02 /
AARINEN, Reino Koivistonkatu 6 FIN-26100 Rauma / FI | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Hakkila, Maini Annika, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy Lautatarhankatu 8 B 00580 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Hakkila, Maini Annika, et al Forssén & Salomaa Oy, Yrjönkatu 30 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00958553.0 | 07.09.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000FI00752 | Priority number, date | FI19990000376U | 08.09.1999 Original published format: FI 990376 U | FI20000000812 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: FI 20000812 | [2001/42] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0117406 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143835 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47G29/14 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A47G29/141 (EP);
F25D29/00 (EP);
F25D31/005 (EP);
A47G2029/145 (EP);
A47G2029/146 (EP);
A47G2029/147 (EP);
F25B2600/07 (EP);
F25D2700/02 (EP);
F25D2700/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WARENANNAHMEKASTEN | [2001/42] | English: | DELIVERY BOX | [2001/42] | French: | ARMOIRE DE STOCKAGE DE LIVRAISONS | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2000 | Translation filed | 26.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0851187 (THERMOVONICS CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]FR2563987 (LILLE SA DISTR GDE BRASSERIE) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *; | [A]DE29807184U (MÜLLER W) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2190137 (MCSWEENEY EUGENE) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4024729 (ABATE SR RUDOLPH ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2274309 (PICKERING ROY ANTHONY) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 7 - line 8 * | Examination | US5774053 |