EP1246807 - NOVEL HYDANTOIN, THIOHYDANTOIN, PYRIMIDINEDIONE AND THIOXOPYRIMIDINONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE AS MEDICINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE CONSEILS DE RECHERCHES ET D'APPLICATIONS SCIENTIFIQUES (S.C.R.A.S.) 51/53 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | [2005/44] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE CONSEILS DE RECHERCHES ET D'APPLICATIONS SCIENTIFIQUES (S.C.R.A.S.) 51/53 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POITOUT, Lydie 2, rue Anatole France F-74270 Le Kremlin-Bicêtre / FR | 02 /
THURIEAU, Christophe 84, avenue Kléber F-75016 Paris / FR | 03 /
BRAULT, Valérie 5, rue de la Ferme de Belleville F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Bourgouin, André BEAUFOUR IPSEN - SCRAS Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 24 Rue Erlanger 75016 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Bourgouin, André Beaufour Ipsen - S.C.R.A.S., 24, rue Erlanger 75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00958634.8 | 28.07.2000 | [2002/41] | WO2000FR02164 | Priority number, date | FR19990009886 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: FR 9909886 | [2002/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0109090 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246807 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246807 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/86, C07D233/78, C07D403/06, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D409/14, C07D407/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/415, A61K31/505, A61P5/02, C07D405/14, // (C07D403/06, 233:00, 233:00) | [2002/41] | CPC: |
C07D233/86 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/02 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D403/04 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDANTOIN-, THIOHYDANTOIN-, PYRIMIDINEDION- UND THIOXOPYRIMIDINON-DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ALS ARZTNEIMITTEL | [2002/41] | English: | NOVEL HYDANTOIN, THIOHYDANTOIN, PYRIMIDINEDIONE AND THIOXOPYRIMIDINONE DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE AS MEDICINES | [2002/41] | French: | DERIVES D'HYDANTOINES, DE THIOHYDANTOINES, DE PYRIMIDINEDIONES ET DE THIOXOPYRIMIDINONES, LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET LEUR APPLICATION A TITRE DE MEDICAMENTS | [2002/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 02.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2005 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/45] | MC | 31.07.2006 | |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 02.11.2005 | |
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | MC | 31.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9743278 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9813045 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO9845285 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [A]WO9858646 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [AP]WO9964401 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [AP] 1-14 * claim - *; | [AP]WO9964420 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [AP] 1-14 * abstract *; | [AP]WO9965942 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [AP] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A] - SCICINSKI J J ET AL, "The solid phase synthesis of a series of tri-substituted hydantoin ligands for the somatostatin SST5 receptor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, (19981215), vol. 8, no. 24, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3609 - 3614, XP004150376 [A] 1-14 * page 3612 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00647-7 | [A] - LIU S ET AL, "Nonpeptide somatostatin agonists with sst4 selectivity: syntheses and structure-activity relationships of thioureas", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (1998), vol. 41, no. 24, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4693 - 4705, XP002136780 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm980118e | [A] - LIU S ET AL, "2-PYRIDYLTHIOUREAS: NOVEL NONPEPTIDE SOMATOSTATIN AGONISTS WITH SST4 SELECTIVITY", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL DESIGN,NL,BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, SCHIPHOL, (1999), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1381-6128, pages 255 - 263, XP000882348 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |