EP1210844 - SENSOR ARRAY MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap-On Equipment Limited Unit 12, Horsleys Fields, King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Barbara Lynn Snap-On Equipment Ltd. Unit 12 Horsleys Fields Kings Lynn Norfolk PE30 5UJ / GB | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00958783.3 | 05.09.2000 | [2002/23] | WO2000GB03398 | Priority number, date | GB19990021142 | 08.09.1999 Original published format: GB 9921142 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0119131 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1210844 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1210844 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/00 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
H04R5/02 (EP,KR,US);
G01D11/16 (KR);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49005 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGE EINER SENSORBAUGRUPPE | [2002/23] | English: | SENSOR ARRAY MOUNTING | [2002/23] | French: | MONTAGES ISOLATEURS D'ENERGIE ET DEFINISSANT DES EMPLACEMENTS | [2002/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2003 | BE | 09.07.2003 | CH | 09.07.2003 | FI | 09.07.2003 | LI | 09.07.2003 | NL | 09.07.2003 | CY | 05.09.2003 | IE | 05.09.2003 | LU | 05.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | DK | 09.10.2003 | GR | 09.10.2003 | SE | 09.10.2003 | DE | 10.10.2003 | ES | 20.10.2003 | PT | 09.12.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/46] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 05.09.2003 | ||
IE | 05.09.2003 | ||
LU | 05.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
DE | 10.10.2003 | ||
ES | 20.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 05.09.2003 | ||
IE | 05.09.2003 | ||
LU | 05.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
DE | 10.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 05.09.2003 | ||
LU | 05.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
DE | 10.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 05.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
DE | 10.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
DE | 10.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
BE | 09.07.2003 | ||
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
CH | 09.07.2003 | ||
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
LI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 09.07.2003 | |
FI | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3913187 (OKUDA SEIZI) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 50 *; | [A]US4534572 (BELTER JEROME G [US]) [A] 2,4-6,8,12-14,17-20 * column 1, lines 34-44 ** column 2, lines 10-53 *; | [A]US4729534 (HILL ROYCE W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7-11,16,17 * column 3, lines 6-13 * * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 60 * * figures 3-27 *; | [DA]WO9304381 (HEIN WERNER CORP [US]) [DA] 1-3,7-9,15-17,21 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 3, lines 29-34 * * page 4, line 27 - page 9, line 30 * |