EP1208307 - CONTROL ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hendrickson International Corporation 500 Park Boulevard Suite 1010 Itasca, IL 60143 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Hendrickson International Corporation 500 Park Boulevard Suite 1010 Itasca, IL 60143 / US | ||
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states THE BOLER COMPANY. 500 Park Boulevard, Suite 1010 Itasca, Illinois 60143-1285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANKOW, Mark, W. 9305 Wallen Court Fort Wayne, IN 46825 / US | 02 /
FORREST, Christopher, W. 206 Hillside Place Auburn, IN 46706 / US | 03 /
MASTRANGELO, Vincent 2724 Misty Oaks Trail Fort Wayne, IN 46845 / US | 04 /
SHOLEEN, Thomas 5304 Franklin Avenue Western Springs, IL 60558 / US | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00959785.7 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000US24132 | Priority number, date | US19990388986 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: US 388986 | [2002/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0116496 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208307 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208307 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.03.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16C7/02, B60G7/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F16C7/02 (EP,US);
B60G2206/11 (EP,US);
B60G2206/1112 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2142 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2153 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2159 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/22] | F16C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/50] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERSTAB | [2002/22] | English: | CONTROL ROD | [2002/22] | French: | TIGE DE COMMANDE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2002 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | IE | 01.09.2011 | LU | 01.09.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 01.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH03287404 ; | [A]JPH1199415 ; | [A]JPH0899511 ; | [Y]US4166640 (VAN DENBERG ERVIN K [US]) [Y] 1,3 * figures 1-3,9,10 *; | [A]DE4300642 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 5 *; | [A]DE4330192 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE4413636 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5639110 (PIERCE WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5662348 (KUSAMA EIICHI [JP], et al) [A] * figures 1,2,7 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920327), vol. 016, no. 122, Database accession no. (M - 1226), & JP03287404 A 19911218 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11099415 A 19990413 (UNIPRES CORP; SHOWA ALUM CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08099511 A 19960416 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP; SANKO SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]GB191212118 (PATRICK HUBERT HARRY); | [Y]US1418084 (BERNARD LAYMAN HEBRON) | by applicant | US3895819 | JPH03287404 |