EP1240637 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR PROVIDING A COMPUTER BASED TRAINING USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indeliq, Inc. 3733 Willow road Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | [2006/13] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Accenture LLP 1661 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAJER, Javier 5 Clockhouse Cotages,Enton Hall,Godalming Surrey GU8 5AR / GB | 02 /
GBEDEMAH, Tim 16 Hawk House,The Falcons,Falcon Road London SW 112NN / GB | [2006/27] |
Former [2002/38] | 01 /
BAJER, Javier Sclockhouse, Enton Hall London / GB | ||
02 /
GBEDEMAH, Tim 2 Arundel Street London WC2R 3LT / GB | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00959823.6 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US24209 | Priority number, date | US19990387193 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 387193 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0116919 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1240637 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1240637 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09B5/14 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
G09B7/02 (EP);
G09B19/00 (EP);
G09B5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND HERGESTELLTER GEGENSTAND FÜR EINE SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR COMPUTERUNTERSTÜTZTES TRAINING | [2002/38] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR PROVIDING A COMPUTER BASED TRAINING USER INTERFACE | [2002/38] | French: | SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET ARTICLE DE FABRICATION DESTINE A FOURNIR UNE INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE FORMATION INFORMATISEE | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06117428.0 / EP1715467 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | BE | 19.07.2006 | CH | 19.07.2006 | CY | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | IT | 19.07.2006 | LI | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | IE | 31.08.2006 | LU | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | SE | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | ES | 30.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 31.08.2006 | ||
LU | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
IE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
ES | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
LI | 19.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5616033 (KERWIN PATRICK A [US]) [A] 1,7,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5911581 (REYNOLDS JOSH [US], et al) [A] 1,7,13 * abstract * * column 12, line 23 - line 37 ** claims 12,23-25 * |