EP1222587 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR ELECTRONIC MERCHANDISING IN AN E-COMMERCE APPLICATION FRAMEWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Accenture LLP 1661 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWMAN-AMUAH, Michel, K. 6426 Peak Vista Circle Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US | [2002/29] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00959864.0 | 31.08.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000US24268 | Priority number, date | US19990387189 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: US 387189 | [2002/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0116848 | Date: | 08.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1222587 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VEFAHREN UND HERGESTELLTER ARTIKEL FÜR DEN ELEKTRONISCHEN HANDEL IN EINER ANWENDUNGSUMGEBUNG DES ELEKTRONISCHEN HANDELS | [2002/29] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR ELECTRONIC MERCHANDISING IN AN E-COMMERCE APPLICATION FRAMEWORK | [2002/29] | French: | MARCHANDISAGE ELECTRONIQUE DANS LE CADRE D'UNE APPLICATION DE COMMERCE ELECTRONIQUE, SYSTEME ET ARTICLE MANUFACTURE A CET EFFET | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2015 | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/32] | 28.03.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 07.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | - Bruce Krulwich, "Information Integration Agents: BargainFinder and NewsFinder", Internet-Based Information Systems: Papers from the 1996 AAAI Workshop, (19961201), pages 72 - 77, URL: http://www.aaai.org/Papers/Workshops/1996/WS-96-06/WS96-06-010.pdf, (20141028), XP055149419 | - GUTTMAN ET AL, "Agent-mediated Electronic Commerce: A Survey", INTERNET CITATION, (199806), URL: http://ecommerce.media.mit.edu/papers/ker98.pdf, (20000126), XP002128711 | - Will Clurman ET AL, "Electronic Commerce with Software Agents Table of Contents", (19970314), URL: http://xenia.media.mit.edu/~guttman/research/commerce/papers/commerce.pdf, (20141029), XP055149635 |