EP1230089 - INKING PLATE FOR ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE AND PROCESS OF PRODUCTION OF AN INKING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/33] | INKING PLATE FOR ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE | ||
[2003/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KBA-GIORI S.A. 4, rue de la Paix 1003 Lausanne / CH | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINA, Raffaele Avenue du Grey, 6 CH-1004 Lausanne / CH | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 00960283.0 | 28.09.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000CH00529 | Priority number, date | CH19990002117 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: CH 211799 | [2002/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138096 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230089 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230089 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/30] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1230089 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/26, B41N7/06 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B41N7/06 (EP,US);
B41F31/26 (EP,KR,US);
B41N2207/02 (EP,US);
B41N2207/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBKLISCHEE EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FARBKLISCHEES | [2003/05] | English: | INKING PLATE FOR ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE AND PROCESS OF PRODUCTION OF AN INKING PLATE | [2003/05] | French: | PLAQUE D'ENCRAGE POUR MACHINE D'IMPRESSION ROTATIVE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PLAQUE D'ENCRAGE | [2003/05] |
Former [2002/33] | FARBKLISCHEE EINER ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE | ||
Former [2002/33] | INKING PLATE FOR ROTARY PRINTING MACHINE | ||
Former [2002/33] | PLAQUE D'ENCRAGE POUR MACHINE D'IMPRESSION ROTATIVE | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.07.2003 | IE | 23.07.2003 | NL | 23.07.2003 | CY | 28.09.2003 | LU | 28.09.2003 | BE | 30.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | DK | 23.10.2003 | GR | 23.10.2003 | ES | 03.11.2003 | PT | 23.12.2003 | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 28.09.2003 | ||
LU | 28.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 28.09.2003 | ||
LU | 28.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 28.09.2003 | ||
LU | 28.09.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
ES | 03.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 28.09.2003 | ||
LU | 28.09.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 28.09.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
IE | 23.07.2003 | ||
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
DK | 23.10.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 23.07.2003 | |
NL | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0176702 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [A] 1,7-9 * figures 1,4 *; | [DA]EP0406157 (DE LA RUE GIORI SA [CH]) [DA] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5257967 (GYSIN MAX [US]) [A] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5282417 (GERMANN ALBRECHT J [DE]) [DA] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5292565 (NAPIER LISA A [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9* the whole document * |