EP1208173 - COATING MATERIAL AND ITS USE FOR PRODUCING HIGHLY SCRATCH RESISTANT MULTILAYER TRANSPARENT LACQUERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | For all designated states Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 48308 Senden / DE | 02 /
BAUMGART, Hubert Am Dornbusch 44a 48163 Münster / DE | 03 /
ZUMBRINK, Andrea Antoniusstr. 17 A 48734 Reken / DE | 04 /
SILBER, Stefan Hermann-Schumacher-Str. 20 47807 Krefeld / DE | 05 /
FARWICK, Thomas Sandbreide 9a 48727 Billerbeck / DE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Fitzner, Uwe, et al Fitzner & Frese PartGmbB Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Fitzner, Uwe, et al Dres. Fitzner & Münch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2002/22] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr., et al Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00960466.1 | 16.08.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP07990 | Priority number, date | DE1999138759 | 16.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19938759 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112736 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208173 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208173 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D151/08, C09D183/10, C09D143/04 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C09D183/10 (EP,US);
C08F290/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/11] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSSTOFF UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHKRATZFESTER MEHRSCHICHTIGER KLARLACKIERUNGEN | [2002/22] | English: | COATING MATERIAL AND ITS USE FOR PRODUCING HIGHLY SCRATCH RESISTANT MULTILAYER TRANSPARENT LACQUERS | [2002/22] | French: | MATIERE DE RECOUVREMENT ET SON UTILISATION POUR REALISER DES MISES EN VERNIS CLAIR HAUTEMENT RESISTANTES A L'ABRASION | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 29.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.03.2005 | GB | 16.03.2005 | IE | 16.03.2005 | IT | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | AT | 16.08.2005 | CY | 16.08.2005 | LU | 16.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
IT | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 16.08.2005 | ||
CY | 16.08.2005 | ||
LU | 16.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 16.08.2005 | ||
CY | 16.08.2005 | ||
LU | 16.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 16.08.2005 | ||
CY | 16.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 16.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 16.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4766185 (RYNTZ ROSE A [US], et al) [A] 1* claims 1-26 *; | [A]EP0284679 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-18 *; | [A]US4873298 (RYNTZ ROSE A [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-24 *; | [A]WO9638490 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-11 *; | [PX]WO0026309 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * claims 1-9 * * page 9, line 9 - line 16 * * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 4 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 23 *; | [E]WO0050178 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1 * claims 1,11,12 * * page 15, line 8 * * page 15, line 14 - line 19 * |