EP1208055 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A YARN PROCESSING SYSTEM AND A YARN PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingenjörsfirman Elektroteknik IETV AB Gamlebyvägen 1 520 11 Vegby / SE | For all designated states IRO Patent AG Oberneuhofstrasse 6 6340 Baar / CH | [2004/49] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Ingenjörsfirman Elektroteknik IETV AB Gamblebyvägen 1 520 11 Vegby / SE | ||
For all designated states IRO Patent AG Oberneuhofstrasse 6 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSSON, Magnus Sämsjövik S-520 11 Vegby / SE | 02 /
THOLANDER, Lars, Helge, Gottfrid Haverdalsvägen 47 S-310 42 Haverdal / SE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00960581.7 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP08565 | Priority number, date | DE1999142121 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19942121 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0117886 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208055 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208055 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65H51/22, B65H59/04 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
D03D47/34 (EP,US);
B65H59/04 (EP,US);
B65H59/387 (EP,US);
D03D47/345 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES FADENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEMS UND FADENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/22] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A YARN PROCESSING SYSTEM AND A YARN PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2002/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE FILS ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE FILS APPROPRIE | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 26.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.12.2004 | SE | 01.03.2005 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/31] | FR | 01.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0396902 (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) [A] 1,2,11,22* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [YA]FR2690910 (SCRIEP [FR]) [Y] 12-14,16 * figure 1; claims 10,11 * [A] 1,11,22; | [XY]EP0863236 (MEC TRINCA COLONEL SILVIO & FI [IT]) [X] 1,11,15,22 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 7; figure 4 * [Y] 12-14,16 |