EP1222220 - FILLER FOR PLASTIC FORMULATIONS BASED ON POLYURETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M ESPE AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states 3M Espe AG Espe Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECHT, Reinhold Am Weidanger 6 D-86916 Kaufering / DE | 02 /
GANGNUS, Bernd Moosweg 2B D-82346 Andechs / DE | 03 /
LECHNER, Günther Am Teilsrain 3 D-82237 Wörthsee / DE | [2003/04] |
Former [2002/29] | 01 /
HECHT, Reinhold Inninger Strasse 6 D-82266 Inning-Buch / DE | ||
02 /
GANGNUS, Bernd Moosweg 2B D-82346 Andechs / DE | |||
03 /
LECHNER, Günther Am Teilsrain 3 D-82237 Wörthsee / DE | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00960583.3 | 01.09.2000 | [2002/29] | WO2000EP08569 | Priority number, date | DE1999141738 | 02.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19941738 | [2002/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0118085 | Date: | 15.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1222220 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1222220 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/12, C08F290/14, A61K6/09, C08G18/66 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
A61K6/71 (EP,US);
A61K6/893 (EP,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08F290/147 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C08G18/6692 (EP,US);
C08G18/67 (EP,US);
C09J151/003 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/893, C08L75/16 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3228 (EP,US);
C08G18/67, C08G18/0823 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜLLSTOFF FÜR KUNSTSTOFF-FORMULIERUNGEN AUF POLYURETHANBASIS | [2002/29] | English: | FILLER FOR PLASTIC FORMULATIONS BASED ON POLYURETHANE | [2002/29] | French: | CHARGE POUR FORMULATIONS DE MATIERE PLASTIQUE A BASE DE POLYURETHANE | [2002/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.08.2003 | IE | 13.08.2003 | IT | 13.08.2003 | NL | 13.08.2003 | AT | 01.09.2003 | CY | 01.09.2003 | LU | 01.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | DK | 13.11.2003 | GR | 13.11.2003 | SE | 13.11.2003 | ES | 24.11.2003 | PT | 13.01.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/11] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
AT | 01.09.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.09.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
IE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 13.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4553940 (KOBLITZ FRANCIS F [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6,8 * column 4, line 24 - line 60 * * examples 1-3 *; | [A]US5135963 (HAEBERLE KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,6,7 * example 2 *; | [DA]US5684081 (DANNHORN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-3,6,7 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 36 ** example 1 *; | [A]EP0872502 (SYNTHOPOL CHEMIE DR KOCH [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 58 * * examples 1,4 * |