Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0219904 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0024357 | 01.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU781458B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2005 | B2 | AU7349400 | 22.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0024357 | 01.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1331873 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2007 | A4 | EP1331873 | 06.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0024357 | 01.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2388819 | 14.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0024357 | 01.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6219567 | 17.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US0024357 | 01.09.2000 | US33738299 | 21.06.1999 |