EP1216170 - SYSTEM FOR RAISING AND LOWERING A BONNET OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Restraint Systems GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 9 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2005/46] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Siemens Restraint Systems GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 9 63755 Alzenau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOUWYNCK, Stéphane Ringstrasse 43 63843 Niedernberg / DE | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 00962319.0 | 16.08.2000 | [2002/26] | WO2000EP07955 | Priority number, date | DE1999146408 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19946408 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0123225 | Date: | 05.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216170 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216170 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34, B62D25/10 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B60R21/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ANHEBEN UND ABSENKEN EINER MOTORHAUBE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2002/26] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RAISING AND LOWERING A BONNET OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2002/26] | French: | SYSTEME POUR FAIRE MONTER ET DESCENDRE UN CAPOT DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 02.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09315266 ; | [A]DE4320226 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19721565 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - line 37 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09315266 A 19971209 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * |